SC H3352 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extend The Prohibition To Information Obtained From Local Governments And Political Subdivisions Of The State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Freedom of Information Act Review

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31 Act No. 67
2017-05-26 Effective date 5/19/17
2017-05-19 Signed By Governor
2017-05-15 Ratified R 102
2017-05-11HouseRoll call Yeas-89 Nays-0
2017-05-11HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2017-05-11SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2017-05-11SenateAmended
2017-05-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-05-10SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2017-05-10SenateRead second time
2017-05-10SenateAmended
2017-05-09SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Young, Fanning
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-23SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-03-23HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-03-22HouseRoll call Yeas-93 Nays-0
2017-03-22HouseRead second time
2017-03-22HouseAmended
2017-03-08HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-22-17
2017-02-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
2017-02-14HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-8-17
2017-02-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell
2017-02-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0099 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3482 (Similar To) 2017-01-17 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0481 (Similar To) 2017-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4396 (Similar To) 2017-11-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
123500(n/a)See Bill Text
123665(n/a)See Bill Text
30250(n/a)See Bill Text
304100(n/a)See Bill Text
304110(n/a)See Bill Text
30430(n/a)See Bill Text
30440(n/a)See Bill Text
30450(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3352&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20161215.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20170208.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20170209.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20170322.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20170503.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20170509.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20170510.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20170511.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3352_20170511A.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12907
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13552
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13620

Bill Comments

feedback