SC H3341 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Recommitted to Charleston Delegation
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

A Bill To Repeal Act 130 Of 2007 Relating To The Increase In The Number Of Members Of The Charleston County Aviation Authority By Two Who Shall Be The Chairman And Vice Chairman Of The Charleston County Delegation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charleston County Aviation Authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-24HouseRecommitted to Charleston Delegation
2015-03-19HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-24-15
2015-03-18HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-19-15
2015-03-05HouseRecalled from Charleston Delegation
2015-01-20HouseReferred to Charleston Delegation
2015-01-20HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0376 (Similar To) 2015-05-14 - Act No. 10

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback