SC H3295 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That An Establishment Possessing A Beer And Wine Permit That Is Located In A County Or Municipality That Has Conducted A Favorable Referendum Allowing The Sale And Consumption Of Alcoholic Liquors By The Drink On Sunday Under The Provisions Of Section 61-6-2010, During Those Same Hours Authorized By Permits Issued Under Section 61-6-2010, May Sell, Possess, And Permit The Consumption Of Beer And Wine On The Premises
Title
Alcoholic permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate: to adopt the conference report (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: To Nonconcur (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: to nonconcur (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 5a (Y: 83 N: 20 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 4a (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Adopt Amendment (Y: 84 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 2a (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Adopt Amendment (Y: 84 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 21 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 21 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate: to adopt the conference report (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: To Nonconcur (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: to nonconcur (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 5a (Y: 83 N: 20 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 4a (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Adopt Amendment (Y: 84 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 2a (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Adopt Amendment (Y: 84 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 21 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 21 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Act No. 67 | |
2011-06-22 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2011-06-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified R 101 | |
2011-06-15 | Ordered enrolled for ratification | |
2011-06-15 | Roll call Ayes-28 Nays-10 | |
2011-06-15 | Conference report received and adopted | |
2011-06-02 | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 | |
2011-06-02 | Conference report received and adopted | |
2011-06-02 | Conference committee appointed Hutto, Campbell, and Davis | |
2011-06-02 | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Tallon, Herbkersman, and Merrill | |
2011-06-01 | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-2 | |
2011-06-01 | Non-concurrence in House amendment | |
2011-05-26 | Returned to Senate with amendments | |
2011-05-26 | Roll call Yeas-77 Nays-22 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate amendment amended | |
2011-05-26 | Reconsidered | |
2011-05-25 | Returned to Senate with amendments | |
2011-05-25 | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-10 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate amendment amended | |
2011-05-25 | Debate adjourned on amendments | |
2011-05-24 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2011-05-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-05-19 | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-2 | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time | |
2011-05-19 | Amended | |
2011-05-19 | Committee Amendment Tabled | |
2011-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-05-11 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Subcommittee: Davis (ch), Sheheen, Massey | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-02-02 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-02-01 | Roll call Yeas-54 Nays-46 | |
2011-02-01 | Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 4 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 4 | 630 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 1820 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 2000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 2010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |