SC H3240 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 53-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "national Concealed Weapons Permit Reciprocity Act" By Revising The Conditions That Allow A Holder Of An Out-of-state Weapons Permit To Carry A Weapon In This State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed weapons permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-05-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-05-04HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-05-03HouseRoll call Yeas-85 Nays-23
2017-05-03HouseRead second time
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-04-26HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 4-27-17
2017-04-19HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 4-20-17
2017-04-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy
2017-04-05HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 4-6-17
2017-04-04HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17
2017-03-30HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 4-4-17
2017-03-29HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-30-17
2017-03-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
2017-03-22HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-23-17
2017-03-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
2017-03-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
2017-03-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson
2017-02-28HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-1-17
2017-02-23HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 2-28-17
2017-02-21HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-02-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2017-02-09HouseMember
2017-01-26HouseMember
2017-01-25HouseMember
2017-01-18HouseMember
2017-01-17HouseMember
2017-01-12HouseMember
2017-01-11HouseMember
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2331215(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback