SC H3238 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tedder
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tedder
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Sections 31-21-65, 59-63-41, And 45-9-11 So As To Make It Unlawful And Against Public Policy Of This State In Housing, Education, And Public Accommodations To Discriminate On The Basis Of Race, Color, Or National Origin, Including Discriminating Against Certain Facial Features, Hair Textures, Hair Types, And Hair Styles Associated With Race; To Amend Section 1-13-30, As Amended, Relating To Definitions, So As To Add Clarifying Definitions To Make It Unlawful And Against Public Policy Of This State In Employment To Discriminate On The Basis Of Race, Color, Or National Origin; And To Amend Section 1-13-80, As Amended, Relating To Exceptions To Unlawful Employment Practices, So As To Provide An Exception To Covered Employers Allowing Them To Prohibit Certain Facial Features, Hair Textures, Hair Types, And Hairstyles Associated With Race When Necessary To The Health And Safety Of The Employee.
Title
Discrimination
Sponsors
Rep. Kambrell Garvin [D] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] | Rep. Jermaine Johnson [D] |
Rep. Chandra Dillard [D] | Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] | Rep. Krystle Matthews [D] | Sen. Deon Tedder [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tedder |
2021-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, Matthews |
2021-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard |
2021-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 13 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 13 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
31 | 21 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 9 | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 63 | 41 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3238&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3238_20201209.htm |