SC H3220 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Article 6 To Chapter 15, Title 63 So As To Enact The "uniform Child Abduction Prevention Act", To Provide A Legal Mechanism To Protect Children From Credible Risks Of Abduction Related To Legal Custody Or Visitation, And For Other Purposes.
Title
Uniform Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] | Rep. Cody Mitchell [R] | Rep. Patrick Haddon [R] |
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. Micajah Caskey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-05-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2023-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-03 | House | Amended |
2023-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-04-26 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2023-04-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2023-04-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |