SC H3190 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: George
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: George
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Person, While Operating A Moped, And His Passengers Must Wear Safety Yellow Reflective Vests.
Title
Mopeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: George |
2013-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.S.McLeod |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2012-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3190&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3190_20121218.htm |