SC H3181 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford, Caskey, Bryant, Clemmons, Hardee, Dillard, Bannister, Willis, G.R.Smith, B.Cox, W.Cox, Huggins, Kirby, Yow, Calhoon, Spires, W.Newton, Hixon, Gilliam, Jefferson, R.Williams, Henegan, Rivers, Ridgeway, Clyburn, Funderburk, Simmons, McDaniel, S.Williams, Ott, Brawley
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford, Caskey, Bryant, Clemmons, Hardee, Dillard, Bannister, Willis, G.R.Smith, B.Cox, W.Cox, Huggins, Kirby, Yow, Calhoon, Spires, W.Newton, Hixon, Gilliam, Jefferson, R.Williams, Henegan, Rivers, Ridgeway, Clyburn, Funderburk, Simmons, McDaniel, S.Williams, Ott, Brawley
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 16-3-2010, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Definitions For Purposes Of Trafficking In Persons Offenses, So As To Revise The Definition Of "sex Trafficking" To Include Certain Sexual Exploitation And Prostitution Offenses Involving Minors; To Amend Section 16-3-2020, As Amended, Relating To The Elements Of Trafficking In Persons Offenses, Penalties, And Defenses, So As To Ensure That A Minor Victim Adjudicated Delinquent For A Violation Of The Article May Have The Record Of Conviction Expunged; To Amend Section 17-30-70, Relating To Procedures For The Interception Of Wire, Oral, Or Electronic Communications, So As To Include In The Purview Of The Statute Offenses Involving Trafficking In Persons; By Adding Section 16-3-2110 So As To Provide For The Appointment Of A Special Victim's Advocate For Minor Victims Of Trafficking In Persons Offenses; By Adding Section 16-3-2120 So As To Direct The Appropriate Agencies To Coordinate With The Human Trafficking Task Force For The Training Of Judges, Prosecutors, And Law Enforcement; And By Adding Section 16-3-2130 So As To Create The Offense Of Promoting Travel For Prostitution Or Sex Trafficking And Provide Penalties.
Title
Human trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford, Caskey, Bryant, Clemmons, Hardee, Dillard, Bannister, Willis, G.R.Smith, B.Cox, W.Cox, Huggins, Kirby, Yow, Calhoon, Spires, W.Newton, Hixon, Gilliam, Jefferson, R.Williams, Henegan, Rivers, Ridgeway, Clyburn, Funderburk, Simmons, McDaniel, S.Williams, Ott, Brawley |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 3 | 2010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 2020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 2110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 2120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 2130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3181&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3181_20181218.htm |