SC H3165 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 8 To Chapter 11, Title 1 So As To Create The "fallen First Responder Survivor Advocate" Position Within The Department Of Administration And Provide Its Duties And Responsibilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fallen First Responders Survivor Advocate position

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Trantham, Oremus, Huggins, Wooten
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback