SC H3162 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-15 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-16
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-15 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-16
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO FIX NOON ON WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 11, 2009, AS THE TIME TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN CHIEF JUDGE OF THE COURT OF APPEALS, SEAT 5, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SEAT 1, TO FILL THE UNEXPIRED TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2010, AND THE SUBSEQUENT FULL TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2016; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE FIFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SEAT 3, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE EIGHTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SEAT 2, TO FILL THE UNEXPIRED TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2012; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE NINTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SEAT 3, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SEAT 2, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE FIFTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SEAT 2, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 1, TO FILL THE UNEXPIRED TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009, AND THE SUBSEQUENT FULL TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2015; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 2, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 3, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 4, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 5, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 6, TO FILL THE UNEXPIRED TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009, AND THE SUBSEQUENT FULL TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2015; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 7, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 8, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 9, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE CIRCUIT COURT, AT-LARGE, SEAT 10, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE FAMILY COURT FOR THE TENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SEAT 1, TO FILL THE UNEXPIRED TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2013; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE FAMILY COURT FOR THE THIRTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, SEAT 6, TO FILL THE UNEXPIRED TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2010, AND THE SUBSEQUENT FULL TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2016; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN CHIEF JUDGE OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE LAW COURT, SEAT 1, WHOSE TERM EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2009; TO ELECT A SUCCESSOR TO A CERTAIN JUDGE OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE LAW COURT, SEAT 4, TO FILL THE UNEXPIRED TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2010, AND THE SUBSEQUENT FULL TERM THAT EXPIRES JUNE 30, 2015.
Title
Fix Noon On Wednesday, February 11, 2009, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Chief Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 5, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The First Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2010, And The Subsequent Full Term That Expires June 30, 2016; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The Fifth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The Eighth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2012; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The Ninth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 1, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2009, And The Subsequent Full Term That Expires June 30, 2015; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 2, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 3, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 4, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 5, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 6, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2009, And The Subsequent Full Term That Expires June 30, 2015; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 7, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 8, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 9, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 10, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court For The Tenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2013; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court For The Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 6, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2010, And The Subsequent Full Term That Expires June 30, 2016; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Chief Judge Of The Administrative Law Court, Seat 1, Whose Term Expires June 30, 2009; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Administrative Law Court, Seat 4, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2010, And The Subsequent Full Term That Expires June 30, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-15 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-16 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced SJ-16 | |
2009-01-15 | Sent to the Senate HJ-434 | |
2009-01-15 | Adopted HJ-434 | |
2009-01-14 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-10 | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-108 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced HJ-106 | |
2008-12-16 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2008-12-16 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0197 (Similar To) 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-162
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3162&session=118 |