SC H3139 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Equal Pay For Equal Work Act", By Adding Chapter 12 To Title 41 So As To Prohibit On The Basis Of Sex The Paying Of Wages To Employees Of One Sex At A Lesser Rate Than The Rate Paid To Employees Of The Opposite Sex For Comparable Work In Jobs Which Require The Same Or Essentially The Same Knowledge, Skill, Effort, And Responsibility; To Provide Definitions, Exceptions, And Prohibit Specific Employer Actions With Regard To These Requirements; And To Provide Administrative And, Where Applicable, Judicial Remedies For Violations.
Title
SC Equal Pay for Equal Work Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Shedron Williams [D] |
Rep. Patricia Henegan [D] | Rep. JA Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3139&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3139_20181218.htm |