SC H3111 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 57-1-410, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Secretary Of The Department Of Transportation, So As To Provide That The Governor Shall Appoint The Secretary Instead Of The Commission Of The Department Of Transportation; To Devolve The Duties Of The Commission Of The Department Of Transportation Upon The Secretary Of The Department Of Transportation; To Amend Section 1-30-10, As Amended, Relating To The Departments Of State Government And Their Governing Bodies, So As To Delete The Provision That Provides That Part Of The Governing Body Of The Department Of Transportation Is A Seven-member Commission; To Amend Section 1-30-105, Relating To The Establishment Of The Department Of Transportation, So As To Provide That The Governing Authority Of The Department Of Transportation Is The Secretary Of Transportation; To Amend Section 11-43-140, Relating To The Board Of Directors Of The Transportation Infrastructure Bank, So As To Remove The Chairman Of The Department Of Transportation Commission As A Director, And To Provide That The Secretary Of Transportation Is A Member Of The Board; To Amend Sections 57-1-10, 57-1-40, 57-1-370, 57-1-430, 57-1-490, And 57-3-20, All Relating To The Establishment Of The Department Of Transportation, And Its Duties And Responsibilities, So As To Eliminate The Department Of Transportation Commission And Its Responsibilities, To Allow The Governor To Appoint The Secretary Of Transportation And Require The Department Of Transportation Submit To The General Assembly An Itemized Project List To Be Funded For The Fiscal Year In Which The General Assembly Would Enact Its Annual General Appropriations Act; To Amend Section 57-1-500, Relating To A Department Of Transportation Ethics Workshop, So As To Delete The Department Of Transportation Commissioners As Participants In This Workshop; To Amend Section 57-3-50, Relating To The Establishment Of Highway Districts, So As To Substitute The Term "department" For The Term "commission"; To Amend Section 57-1-90, Relating To Motorcycles, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-3-210, Relating To The Department Of Transportation Contracting With Public Transit Systems, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-3-700, Relating To The Department Of Transportation Serving As An Agent For Counties, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-5-10, Relating To The Composition Of The State Highway System, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-5-50, Relating To The Transfer Of Certain Roads, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-5-90, Relating To Belt Lines And Spurs, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-5-310, Relating To The Ownership Of Real Estate, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-5-340, Relating To The Disposition Of Real Estate, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-5-1350, Relating To Turnpikes, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Sections 57-13-10, 57-13-20, 57-13-40, And 57-13-50, All Relating To Bridges, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Section 57-25-120, Relating To Definitions, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Sections 57-25-140, 57-25-150, 57-25-170, 57-25-200, And 57-25-210, All Relating To Signs Along The Highways, So As To Make A Conforming Change; And To Repeal Sections 57-1-310, 57-1-320, 57-1-325, 57-1-330, 57-1-340, 57-1-350, 57-1-460, 57-1-470, Article 7, Chapter 1, Title 57, And Sections 6, 7, And 8 Of Act 114 Of 2007 All Relating To The Creation And Functions Of The Department Of Transportation And Its Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOT Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
2019-05-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2019-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13010(n/a)See Bill Text
130105(n/a)See Bill Text
1143140(n/a)See Bill Text
57110(n/a)See Bill Text
571310(n/a)See Bill Text
571320(n/a)See Bill Text
571325(n/a)See Bill Text
571330(n/a)See Bill Text
571340(n/a)See Bill Text
571350(n/a)See Bill Text
571370(n/a)See Bill Text
57140(n/a)See Bill Text
571410(n/a)See Bill Text
571430(n/a)See Bill Text
571460(n/a)See Bill Text
571470(n/a)See Bill Text
571490(n/a)See Bill Text
571500(n/a)See Bill Text
57190(n/a)See Bill Text
571310(n/a)See Bill Text
571320(n/a)See Bill Text
571340(n/a)See Bill Text
571350(n/a)See Bill Text
5725120(n/a)See Bill Text
5725140(n/a)See Bill Text
5725150(n/a)See Bill Text
5725170(n/a)See Bill Text
5725200(n/a)See Bill Text
5725210(n/a)See Bill Text
57320(n/a)See Bill Text
573210(n/a)See Bill Text
57350(n/a)See Bill Text
573700(n/a)See Bill Text
57510(n/a)See Bill Text
5751350(n/a)See Bill Text
575310(n/a)See Bill Text
575340(n/a)See Bill Text
57550(n/a)See Bill Text
57590(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback