SC H3105 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Chapter 32, Title 1, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The "south Carolina Religious Freedom Act", So As To Provide That Religious Services Are Deemed An Essential Service During A State Of Emergency And Must Be Allowed To Continue Operating Throughout The State Of Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Religious Freedom Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
2021-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler, Herbkersman, W.Newton
2021-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: T.Moore
2021-02-25HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Lucas, Crawford, Erickson, Bradley
2021-02-24HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-02-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, D.C.Moss, Ballentine
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith
2021-02-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bryant, Elliott
2021-02-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
2021-02-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McCabe, Dabney
2021-02-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon
2021-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2021-02-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott, Willis
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Nutt, Trantham, Oremus, McGarry
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback