SC H3073 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, McDaniel, Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, McDaniel, Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 27-40-250 So As To Require That A Tenant And Landlord Engage In Mediation After The Ejection Action Is Instituted Within Thirty Days.
Title
Landlord and tenants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, McDaniel, Henderson-Myers |
2021-03-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2021-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Matthews |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3073&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3073_20201209.htm |