SC H3058 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 2 To Chapter 31, Title 23 Entitled "firearms Criminal Background Checks" So As To Require That A National Instant Criminal Background Check Must Be Completed And Delivery Of A Firearm To A Purchaser Or Transferee May Not Take Place Until The Results Of All Required Background Checks Are Known And The Purchaser Or Transferee Is Not Prohibited From Delivery Of The Firearm.
Title
Firearms Criminal Background Checks
Sponsors
Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. Shedron Williams [D] |
Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] | Rep. Patricia Henegan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2019-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3059 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3058&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3058_20181218.htm |