SC H3032 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Sections 9-1-1790 And 9-11-90, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Earnings Limitation Upon Return To Covered Employment In The South Carolina Retirement System And The South Carolina Police Officers Retirement System Respectively, So As To Increase The Amount That May Be Earned Without Affecting The Monthly Retirement Allowance From Ten Thousand Dollars To Fifty Thousand Dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement system, earning limitations upon return to work to covered employment in SCRS and SCPORS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0328 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H3557 (Similar To) 2021-02-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry
H3595 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
911790(n/a)See Bill Text
91190(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback