SC H3014 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Chapter 31 To Title 37 So As To Enact The "south Carolina Cellular Data Privacy Protection Act"; To Define Relevant Terms, To Prohibit A Mobile Telecommunications Provider From Selling A Customer's Personal Data To A Third Party, To Impose A Penalty, And To Authorize The Attorney General To Investigate And Enforce Alleged Violations Of This Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Cellular Data Privacy Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback