SC H3006 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 182
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 182
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-63-785 So As To Provide Public Schools, Public School Districts, Charter Schools, And Charter School Governing Bodies May Not Use Debt Collection Agencies To Collect Or Attempt To Collect Outstanding Debts On Student School Lunch Or Breakfast Accounts, To Provide Public Schools, Public School Districts, Charter Schools, And Charter School Governing Bodies May Not Assess Or Collect Any Interest, Fees, Or Other Such Monetary Penalties For Outstanding Debts For Student School Lunch Or Breakfast Accounts, To Provide Necessary Definitions, And To Make The Provisions Of This Act Applicable To Debts On Student Lunch And Breakfast Accounts Outstanding On The Effective Date Of This Act And Incurred After The Effective Date Of This Act. - Ratified Title
Title
School lunch, debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 182 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/22 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 196 | |
2022-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-29 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-04-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Garvin |
2021-04-28 | House | Debate adjourned |
2021-04-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, King, Gilliard, Murray, McDaniel |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2021-04-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2021-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, J.L.Johnson |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |