SC H3002 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bustos, Nutt, Yow, Huggins
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 59-29-120, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To American Founding Principles Instruction Required In Public High Schools And Publicly Supported Colleges And Universities, So As To Provide Specific Requirements Concerning Instruction In United States Foundational History In Public High Schools; To Amend Section 59-120-130, Relating To The Duration Of Required American Founding Principles Instruction, So As To Limit Its Application With Respect To Public Institutions Of Higher Learning; To Amend Section 59-29-140, Relating To The Requirement That The State Superintendent Of Education Prescribe Certain Texts For Use In Required American Founding Principles Instruction, So As To Specify Certain Texts That Must Be Included; And To Amend Section 59-29-155, Relating To Related Requirements Of The State Board Of Education And The Education Oversight Committee, So As To Make Conforming Changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instruction, American founding principles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bustos, Nutt, Yow, Huggins
2021-02-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Hiott
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry, Jones
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: May, Dabney
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59120130(n/a)See Bill Text
5929120(n/a)See Bill Text
5929140(n/a)See Bill Text
5929155(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback