RI S3129 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the Honorable John J.J. Jones, Jr., to join June Friedmann and Allen Smith in marriage on or about September 4, 2014, within the Town of New Shoreham, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |