RI S3102 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Imposition, Amount, Collection And Apportionment Of Access And Parking Fees At Rhode Island Public Beaches (this Resolution Would Create A Five Member Commission To Study The Imposition, Amount, Collection And Apportionment Of Access And Parking Fees At Ri Public Beaches, Who Would Report Back By January 7, 2015, And Would Expire On March 7, 2015.)
Title
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Imposition, Amount, Collection And Apportionment Of Access And Parking Fees At Rhode Island Public Beaches (this Resolution Would Create A Five Member Commission To Study The Imposition, Amount, Collection And Apportionment Of Access And Parking Fees At Ri Public Beaches, Who Would Report Back By January 7, 2015, And Would Expire On March 7, 2015.)
Sponsors
Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2014) |