RI S3078 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempt from taxation the property of YWCA Rhode Island, a nonprofit corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Exempting From Taxation The Real And Personal Property Of Ywca Rhode Island

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-08HouseSigned by Governor
2014-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2014-06-20SenateHouse passed in concurrence
2014-06-20SenatePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2014)
2014-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2014-06-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014)
2014-06-19SenateReferred to House Municipal Government
2014-06-18SenateSenate read and passed
2014-06-17SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014)
2014-06-16SenateCommittee recommends passage
2014-06-13SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014)
2014-06-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback