RI S3072 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes technical change to foreclosure mediation.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate held on desk |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |