RI S3062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Sophia Academy, San Miguel Education Center, and Community Preparatory School, Inc., all of which are located in the city of Providence.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |