RI S3061 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a special motor vehicle registration plate for The Rose Island Lighthouse Foundation, Inc.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |