RI S3046 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates DCYF to develop a transition plan for children under family court oversight prior to age 18 as well as children with educational/emotional/developmental disabilities and limits court's jurisdiction up to 19 for wayward/deliquent children.
Title
Proceedings In Family Court
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S3046.pdf |