RI S3045 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Patient Access To Medically Necessary Mental Health Prescription Drugs
Title
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Patient Access To Medically Necessary Mental Health Prescription Drugs
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-06-11 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-11 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S3045.pdf |