RI S3039 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any entity that receives, maintains, stores or preserves sexual assault evidence kits to submit a report to the department of health, annually, setting forth the total number of untested kits in possession of such entity.
Title
Sexual Assault Evidence Kits
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |