RI S3037 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Committee recommends no passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Committee recommends no passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the membership of the energy facility siting board from three (3) to nine (9) members, and requires approval by the electors in Burrillville of any tax agreement established by the town council with a power plant located in the town.
Title
Energy Facility Siting Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends no passage |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |