RI S3037 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Licenses (would Exempt The Premises (assessor's Plat 37, Lot 69) In The Town Of Portsmouth From The Restriction Imposed By Section 3-7-19 Regarding The Issuance Of Liquor License To Premises Located Within 200 Feet Of A Church Or School.)
Title
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Licenses (would Exempt The Premises (assessor's Plat 37, Lot 69) In The Town Of Portsmouth From The Restriction Imposed By Section 3-7-19 Regarding The Issuance Of Liquor License To Premises Located Within 200 Feet Of A Church Or School.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-11 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S3037.pdf |