RI S3036 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends various sections of law relating to the certification, training and licensing of barbers, hairdressers, cosmeticians, manicurists and estheticians.
Title
Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists And Esthetician
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-16 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |