RI S3035 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides health care coverage for laparoscopic removal of uterine fibroids, including uterine artery embolization intraoperative ultrasound guidance and monitoring and radiofrequency ablation, commencing January 1, 2023.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |