RI S3032 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Finance Renovations And Improvements To The Fire Department And Department Of Public Works Facility In The Town By The Issuance Of Not More Than $7,500,000 Bonds And/or Notes Therefor (would Authorize The Town Of Middletown To Issue Not More Than $7,500,000 Bonds And Notes To Finance Renovations And Improvements To The Fire Department And Department Of Public Works Facility In The Town.)
Title
An Act Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Finance Renovations And Improvements To The Fire Department And Department Of Public Works Facility In The Town By The Issuance Of Not More Than $7,500,000 Bonds And/or Notes Therefor (would Authorize The Town Of Middletown To Issue Not More Than $7,500,000 Bonds And Notes To Finance Renovations And Improvements To The Fire Department And Department Of Public Works Facility In The Town.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-11 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S3032.pdf |