RI S3031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-11 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-11 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION - Removes the exemption from taxation granted to Bryant University located in Smithfield, RI subjecting the university to full taxation unless, the university and the town of Smithfield reach an agreement on payment in lieu of taxes on or before 6/30/24.
Title
Removes the exemption from taxation granted to Bryant University located in Smithfield, RI subjecting the university to full taxation unless, the university and the town of Smithfield reach an agreement on payment in lieu of taxes on or before 6/30/24.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S3031.pdf |