RI S3031 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Finance The Construction Of A Beach Pavilion, Including A Bathhouse, Concession Stand And Other Related Beach Facilities, And Improvements To Recreational Areas In The Town By The Issuance Of Not More Than $6,000,000 Bonds And/or Notes Therefor
Title
An Act Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Finance The Construction Of A Beach Pavilion, Including A Bathhouse, Concession Stand And Other Related Beach Facilities, And Improvements To Recreational Areas In The Town By The Issuance Of Not More Than $6,000,000 Bonds And/or Notes Therefor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-11 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S3031.pdf |