RI S3019 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Surgi-care, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Surgi-care, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-08 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-08 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/24/2016) |