RI S3013 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the extension of credit to players at the Twin River gaming facility, and would establish the statutory guidelines governing such extension of credit.
Title
Video Lottery Terminal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Video lottery terminal approval of amendment lc 005611/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |