RI S3012 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Town Of Bristol To Finance The Design, Engineering And Construction Of Capital Improvement Projects Including, Without Limitation, Drainage, Open Space And Property Acquisition For Municipal Purposes, Road Repairs And Improvements, Additions And Renovations To Public Buildings, And The Acquiring Of Equipment In Connection Therewith By Issuance Of Not More Than $9,000,000 Bonds Therefor
Title
An Act Authorizing The Town Of Bristol To Finance The Design, Engineering And Construction Of Capital Improvement Projects Including, Without Limitation, Drainage, Open Space And Property Acquisition For Municipal Purposes, Road Repairs And Improvements, Additions And Renovations To Public Buildings, And The Acquiring Of Equipment In Connection Therewith By Issuance Of Not More Than $9,000,000 Bonds Therefor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-11 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S3012.pdf |