RI S3001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Revenue Protection (would Make Amendments Regarding Gaming In Ri, Specifically Table. Would Provide For The Regulation Of Table Gaming, Also Would Revise The Allocation Of Revenue In The Event Table Gaming Is Approved At Newport Grand And/or Twin River By Appropriate Vote.)
Title
An Act Relating To Revenue Protection (would Make Amendments Regarding Gaming In Ri, Specifically Table. Would Provide For The Regulation Of Table Gaming, Also Would Revise The Allocation Of Revenue In The Event Table Gaming Is Approved At Newport Grand And/or Twin River By Appropriate Vote.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-06-11 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-08 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-06-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2012) | |
2012-05-29 | Committee heard and continued | |
2012-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S3001.pdf |