RI S2994 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES - Amends provisions relative to the application of zoning ordinances pertaining to wetland buffers to projects for development, redevelopment, construction or rehabilitation.
Title
Amends provisions relative to the application of zoning ordinances pertaining to wetland buffers to projects for development, redevelopment, construction or rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2024) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |