RI S2993 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants a "Police Chief Emeritus" license plate to North Providence Police Chief (Retired) Ernest Spaziano.
Title
Police Chief Emeritus License Plate--north Providence
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2993.pdf |