RI S2989 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds the town of Burrillville to those towns wherein taxes assessed on a mobile or manufactured home would constitute a lien on said home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collection Of Taxes Generally

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-06-21SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-21SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback