RI S2983 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health director/attorney general to conduct hospital conversion investigations with stenographic record of the proceedings.
Title
The Hospital Conversion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |