RI S2973 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As The "rhode Island Complete Count Committee" (creates A 31 Member Committee To Develop, Recommend, And Assist In The Administration Of A Census Outreach Strategy, And Who Would Make An Interim Report By January 15, 2019, A Final Report By June 30, 2019, And Expire On December 31, 2020.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As The "rhode Island Complete Count Committee" (creates A 31 Member Committee To Develop, Recommend, And Assist In The Administration Of A Census Outreach Strategy, And Who Would Make An Interim Report By January 15, 2019, A Final Report By June 30, 2019, And Expire On December 31, 2020.)
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |