RI S2970 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Postpones the date of the next Warren property revaluation until 2016.
Title
Warren Reevaluation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |