RI S2969 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a property tax exemption of up to $250,000 and for totally disabled veterans residing in the city of Cranston and would also apply to any surviving spouse of that veteran.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation - Veterans' Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/09/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |