RI S2946 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improves the usefulness and value of the prescription drug monitoring database program by adding analytical functions, requiring program updates at least weekly, and incorporating data from similar programs in other states.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |