RI S2943 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a procedure for the automatic sealing of records of persons acquitted or otherwise exonerated by operation of law or by motion.
Title
Identification And Apprehension Of Criminals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |