RI S2934 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Rhode Island reinsurance program and restricted receipt account, from federal funding, administered by the director of the Rhode Island health benefits exchange, to mitigate the impact of high-risk individuals on health insurance rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care--health Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-08HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-06-07SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/07/2018)
2018-05-31SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-05-29SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback