RI S2913 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Jamestown to issue not more than $5,900,000 bonds and notes to finance various improvements and related equipment at the town of Jamestown's schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of Jamestown To Issue General Obligation Bonds And Notes In An Amount Not To Exceed $5,900,000 To Finance Replacements, Renovations And Improvements And Related Equipment At The Jamestown Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-19HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-06-13SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2018)
2018-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-05-17SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback